EP1130735 - Circuit arrangement for regulating the transmission power of a battery operated radio device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wahl, Martin Loisachstrasse 4 81377 München / DE | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Epping, Hermann, Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/36] | Fischer, Volker, Dipl.-Ing., et al Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100334.0 | 04.01.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | DE2000102523 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10002523 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130735 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130735 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130735 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/30 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H03G3/007 (EP,US);
H04B1/04 (EP,US);
H04B2001/0416 (EP,US);
H04W52/28 (EP,US);
H04W52/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/36] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/05] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Regelung der Sendeleistung eines batteriebetriebenen Funkgeräts | [2001/36] | English: | Circuit arrangement for regulating the transmission power of a battery operated radio device | [2001/36] | French: | Circuit pour régler le puissance d'émission d'un dispositif radio à batterie | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 10.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.01.2007 | GB | 03.01.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | GB | 03.01.2007 | |
FR | 24.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | GB | 03.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4709404 (TAMURA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 38 - column 5, line 12; figures 4,9 *; | [X]US5896261 (BLACK GREGORY REDMOND [US]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 2, line 6 - column 6, line 23 ** figure 1 * |