EP1148178 - Device for assembling and disassembling a work implement on a mobile tool carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stehr, Jürgen Am Johannesgarten 5 36318 Schwalmtal/Storndorf / DE | [2001/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Knefel, Cordula Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel Postfach 19 24 35529 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Knefel, Cordula, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel Postfach 19 24 35529 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100541.0 | 10.01.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | DE2000205995U | 04.04.2000 Original published format: DE 20005995 U | [2001/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1148178 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1148178 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
E02F3/3604 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/28] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Montieren und Demontieren eines Arbeitsgerätes an einem fahrbaren Geräteträger | [2001/43] | English: | Device for assembling and disassembling a work implement on a mobile tool carrier | [2001/43] | French: | Dispositif pour monter et démonter un outil de travail sur un porteur d'outils mobile | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/04] | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.06.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3804277 (SHIVE H, et al) [X] 1-4,7,8 * figure - *; | [A]US4561505 (WILLIAMSON GERALD E [US]) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [X]US4687405 (OLNEY DAVID I [US]) [X] 1-9 * figures 1,2A-C,4A-B *; | [X]GB2251592 (ROBERTS & GRIFFITHS [GB]) [X] 1-7,9 * figure - *; | [A]DE4314293 (THUMM HEINZ OELHYDRAULIK [DE]) [A] 4* figure 2 * |