EP1111014 - Viscosity conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyotaro, Yoshioka 2-35 Higashiogu 7-chome, Arakawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kaoru, Komiya 2-35 Higashiogu 7-chome, Arakawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Andrews, Timothy Stephen Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Andrews, Timothy Stephen Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01100659.0 | 03.09.1996 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | JP19950229456 | 06.09.1995 Original published format: JP 22945695 | JP19950229458 | 06.09.1995 Original published format: JP 22945895 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1111014 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111014 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/12, C08G18/28 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
C09D5/024 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/283 (EP,KR,US);
C08L75/08 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/43 (EP,US);
Y10S526/932 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/26] | Title | German: | Viskositätskonditionierer | [2003/11] | English: | Viscosity conditioner | [2001/26] | French: | Composé régulateur de la viscosité | [2003/11] |
Former [2001/26] | Verdickungsmittel | ||
Former [2001/26] | Agent épaississant | Examination procedure | 06.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96306384.7 / EP0761780 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0639595 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,6 * * page 2, line 53 - page 5, line 17 *; | [A]US4079028 (EMMONS WILLIAM D, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,19 * * examples 75-96 * | Examination | EP0761779 |