EP1106970 - Device for detecting position of moving body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASMO CO., LTD. 390 Umeda Kosai-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states ASMO CO., LTD. 390 Umeda Kosai-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torii, Katsuhiko 1066-108, Nakanogo, Arai-cho Hamana-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamura, Kengo 5850-3, Shinjo Kosai-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Ikeya, Mitsuhiro 1127, Kamihara-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Kano, Wataru 25-40, Aza-Nishiyama, Imure-cho Toyohashi-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Suzuki, Tatsuya, Asmo Co., Ltd. 390 Umeda Kosai-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100748.1 | 07.02.1997 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | JP19960024197 | 09.02.1996 Original published format: JP 2419796 | JP19960043621 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: JP 4362196 | JP19960045189 | 01.03.1996 Original published format: JP 4518996 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1106970 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/25 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
H01H3/58 (EP,US);
G01D5/04 (EP,US);
G01D5/25 (EP,US);
H01H19/18 (EP,US);
H01H2300/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Position eines sich bewegenden Körpers | [2001/24] | English: | Device for detecting position of moving body | [2001/24] | French: | Dispositif de détection de la position d'un objet en mouvement | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/09] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97101996.3 / EP0789227 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   09.08.2001 | 28.02.2010 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |