EP1132435 - Aqueous powder coat dispersons, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doessel, Karl Friedrich Hardstrasse 135 42107 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Reis, Oliver Thiestrasse 3 58456 Witten / DE | 03 /
Rekowski, Volker Im Stengelken 6 44892 Bochum / DE | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Axalta - Biering/Blum/Kimpel Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | DuPont Performance Coatings, Christine Biering/Christine Kimpel Patent and License Department, Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2001/37] | Biering, Christine, et al DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH und Co. KG Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100811.7 | 15.01.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | US20000520813 | 08.03.2000 Original published format: US 520813 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1132435 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1132435 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/02, C09D7/12 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
C09D5/028 (EP,US);
C09D5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wässrige Pulverlack-Dispersionen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [2001/37] | English: | Aqueous powder coat dispersons, process for their preparation and their use | [2001/37] | French: | Dispersions aqueuses de revêtements en poudre, leurs procédé de préparations et leurs utilisations | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 28.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | BE | 01.06.2005 | CH | 01.06.2005 | CY | 01.06.2005 | FI | 01.06.2005 | IT | 01.06.2005 | LI | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | TR | 01.06.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | GR | 01.09.2005 | SE | 01.09.2005 | ES | 12.09.2005 | PT | 03.11.2005 | GB | 15.01.2006 | IE | 16.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
TR | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
GB | 15.01.2006 | ||
IE | 16.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
GB | 15.01.2006 | ||
IE | 16.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
GB | 15.01.2006 | ||
IE | 16.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 01.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4476271 (KANO MASAFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,10,12 * column 3, lines 5-20 * * column 4, lines 5-64 * * column 5, lines 14-33 * * column 8, lines 8-38 * * column 11, lines 40-55 *; | [A]DE19540977 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]) [A] 1,6,7,10,12 * column 6, lines 13-21 * * column 6, lines 38-41 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 8 ** column 8, lines 15-17 *; | [X]EP0832947 (BASF CORP [US]) [X] 1,6,7 * page 2, lines 40-45 * * page 5, lines 36-58 * * page 7, lines 17,18 * |