EP1223377 - Light with a double reflector that is adjustable by an elastic ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Michl, Oliver Strelitzer Strasse 2 10115 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Frieling, Patrick Strelitzer Strasse 2 10115 Berlin / DE | [2002/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pohlmann, Jens Bettinastrasse 26 63067 Offenbach/Main / DE | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Paustian, Othmar Boeters & Lieck Patentanwälte Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Paustian, Othmar BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/29] | Paustian, Othmar, Dr.-Ing c/o Lieck & Partner GbR, Widenmayerstrasse 36 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100843.0 | 15.01.2001 | [2002/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1223377 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F21V17/02, F21V1/08, F21V17/00 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
F21V17/02 (EP);
F21V1/08 (EP);
F21V17/168 (EP);
F21V7/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/15] |
Former [2002/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Leuchte mit einem elastischen Ring als Verstelleinrichtung fÜr einen Doppelreflektor | [2002/29] | English: | Light with a double reflector that is adjustable by an elastic ring | [2002/29] | French: | Lampe avec un réflecteur double ajustable grace à un anneau élastique | [2002/29] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/44] | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.02.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.02.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2637748 (ZANKER HELMUT) [A] 1 * page 9, paragraphs 4,5 * * page 10, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 1 ** figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE4332352 (REICHERT GERHARD EMIL DIPL ING [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract * * column 2, lines 47-58 * * figures 1-3 *; | [AD]DE19737341 (POHLMANN JENS [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE4332352 | DE19737341 |