EP1223254 - An insulation system of a building wherein vertical air-flow zones divided by orientation or each facade of the building is controlled by open-close method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Himssen Esco Co., Ltd. 3 Fl., Suite 303, Keun Young Bldg., 735-32 Yeoksam-Dong, Kangnam-Ku Seoul 135-080 / KR | [2002/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shim, Shang Kooun 202 Seoul Villa 913-5 Bangbae 1 Dong Seocho-ku, Seoul / KR | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100921.4 | 16.01.2001 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1223254 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/76, F24J2/04 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
E04B1/7612 (EP,US);
F24S20/66 (EP,US);
F24S2020/183 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/15] |
Former [2002/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bautenisolierungssystem, das in Zonen mit vertikaler, durch Öffnen/Schliessen gesteuerter Luftströmung nach der Fassadenorientierung aufgeteilt ist | [2002/29] | English: | An insulation system of a building wherein vertical air-flow zones divided by orientation or each facade of the building is controlled by open-close method | [2002/29] | French: | Système d'isolation de bâtiment divisé, suivant l'orientation des façades, en zones à débit vertical d'air contrôlé par ouverture et fermeture | [2002/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 01.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000320033 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 08, Database accession no. 2001-067381, XP002162258 & JP2000320033 A 00000000 (HINSEN ISCO CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * |