EP1120591 - Diaphragm for adjusting the useful passage area in submersed devices for oxygenating tanks for collecting storm sewage and wastewater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zenit Investments S.p.A. Via Baccelli 44 41100 Modena / IT | [2005/09] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Zenit S.p.A. Via dell' Industria, 15 41018 San Cesario Sul Panaro (Modena) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bottan, Davide Via Allegretti, 98 41100 Modena / IT | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Gardi Patents SAS Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Gardi Patents SAS Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/31] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano Gardi Patents, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01101189.7 | 24.01.2001 | [2001/31] | Priority number, date | IT2000MO00005U | 27.01.2000 Original published format: IT MO000005 U | [2001/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1120591 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1120591 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1120591 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/00 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
F16K7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/31] | Title | German: | Membran zum Justieren vom Durchlass in einem sinkbarem Gerät für Sauerstoffbehälter zur Sammlung von Sturmabwasser | [2001/31] | English: | Diaphragm for adjusting the useful passage area in submersed devices for oxygenating tanks for collecting storm sewage and wastewater | [2001/31] | French: | Membrane pour ajuster le passage dans un dispositif immergé pour un réservoir d'oxygène pour collecter des eaux d'égouts et d'orage | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 02.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2005 | BE | 12.01.2005 | CH | 12.01.2005 | FI | 12.01.2005 | FR | 12.01.2005 | GR | 12.01.2005 | LI | 12.01.2005 | NL | 12.01.2005 | TR | 12.01.2005 | CY | 24.01.2005 | IE | 24.01.2005 | LU | 24.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | DK | 12.04.2005 | GB | 12.04.2005 | ES | 23.04.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | [2016/03] |
Former [2008/23] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
GR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
CY | 24.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
LU | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
Former [2008/03] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
CY | 24.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
LU | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
CY | 24.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
LU | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
LU | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 12.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4157304 (MOLVAR ALLEN E [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 27 - line 59; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US4210534 (MOLVAR ALLEN E [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 25; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0302708 (DIFTECH CORP [US]) [A] 1* page 7, line 44 - line 65; figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO9005583 (DUNNE STEPHEN TERENCE [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |