EP1226888 - Method for producing rack bar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushikigaisha Koshingiken 110-6 Matsumoto Mishima-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Kabushikigaisha Koshingiken 110-6 Matsumoto Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiokawa, Seiji 101-1 Matsumoto Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101581.5 | 25.01.2001 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226888 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226888 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B21K1/76 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
B62D3/126 (EP);
B21K1/767 (EP);
B21K1/768 (EP);
C21D1/34 (EP);
C21D8/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/17] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Zahnstange | [2002/31] | English: | Method for producing rack bar | [2002/31] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une crémailère | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04006750.6 / EP1447158 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4598451 (OHKI TAKANOSUKE [JP]) [A] 1,2* column 3, line 11 - line 39; figure 5 *; | [XA]EP1020243 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE JAPAN CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 3 - line 23; figure - * [A] 3,4 |