EP1126700 - A method for locating a program in a program guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10333 North Meridian Street Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10330 North Meridian St Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maze, Kenneth Wayne, c/o Thomson multimedia 46, quai Alphonse le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 02 /
Miller, Robert Howard, c/o Thomson multimedia 46, quai Alphonse le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 03 /
Reavis, Jeffrey Philip, c/o Thomson multimedia 46, quai Alphonso le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 04 /
Crosby, Sheila Renee, c/o Thomson multimedia 46, quai Alphonso le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 05 /
Wehmeyer, Keith Reynolds, c/o Thomson multimedia 46, quai Alphonso le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 06 /
Brown, Megan Louise, c/o Thomson multimedia 46, quai Alphonso le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 07 /
Morrison, Hugh Boyd, c/o Thomson multimedia 46, quai Alphonso le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Ståhl, Björn Niclas, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Ståhl, Björn Niclas, et al Technicolor 1 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/19] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2001/34] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01101589.8 | 09.11.1996 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | US19950006889 | 17.11.1995 Original published format: US 6889 | US19950574440 | 15.12.1995 Original published format: US 574440 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1126700 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1126700 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N5/445 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
H04N21/4828 (EP);
H04N21/26283 (EP);
H04N21/4334 (EP);
H04N21/47214 (EP);
H04N21/482 (EP);
H04N21/4821 (EP);
H04N5/782 (EP);
H04N7/163 (EP);
H04N7/173 (EP);
H04N21/42204 (EP);
H04N21/4316 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
H04N5/775 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/34] | H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Lokalisierung eines Programms in einem Programmführer | [2001/34] | English: | A method for locating a program in a program guide | [2001/34] | French: | Méthode de localisation d'un programme dans un guide de programme | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 15.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 12.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/26] | 03.02.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96117991.8 / EP0774868 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960117991) is 28.09.1999 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9322877 (ICTV INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 34, line 28 - line 34; figures 38-40 * * figures 26-41 * [Y] 4; | [XY]WO9414284 (DISCOVERY COMMUNICAT INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * page 64, line 7 - page 65, line 15 * * page 68, line 14 - page 69, line 2; figures 11a,12a,12b *[Y] 4 | by applicant | WO9322877 | WO9414284 |