EP1126102 - Vehicle lock and method of controlling said lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Schliesssysteme GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 42 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2003/41] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koerwer, Matthias Cronenberger Strasse 174 42119 Wuppertal / DE | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2003/15] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101908.0 | 27.01.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | DE20001006118 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10006118 | [2001/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1126102 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1126102 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/22, E05B65/12, E05B47/00 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
E05B81/14 (EP,US);
E05B81/64 (EP,US);
E05B81/06 (EP,US);
Y10S292/03 (EP,US);
Y10S292/66 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1082 (EP,US);
Y10T292/699 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/18] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloss und Verfahren zum Steuern desselben | [2001/34] | English: | Vehicle lock and method of controlling said lock | [2001/34] | French: | Serrure pour véhicule et procédé de commande pour une telle serrure | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 31.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/13] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0147549 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-10* page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 26 *; | [X]EP0785323 (NISSAN EUROP TECH CENTRE [GB]) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 31 *; | [X]DE19819611 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 33 * |