EP1226778 - Nozzle for a suction cleaner apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wessel-Werk GmbH Im Bruch 2 51580 Reichshof-Wildbergerhütte / DE | [2007/36] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states WESSEL-WERK GMBH Im Bruch 2 51580 Reichshof-Wildbergerhütte / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dilger, Horst Kornseifener Str. 7 51597 Morsbach / DE | 02 /
Kaffenberger, Dieter Im Wiehler Feld 43 51674 Wiehl / DE | 03 /
Richl, Klaus-Dieter Hauptmannstrasse 1 57489 Drolshagen / DE | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101956.9 | 29.01.2001 | [2002/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226778 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226778 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/30 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
A47L9/30 (EP,US);
A47L9/02 (EP,US);
Y10S362/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [2003/17] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Saugkopf für ein Saugreinigungsgerät | [2002/31] | English: | Nozzle for a suction cleaner apparatus | [2002/31] | French: | Tête de succion pour un appareil de nettoyage par aspiration | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 31.01.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000135187 ; | [A]EP0231419 (INTERLAVA AG); | [A]US4728942 (ENGLAND JOHN F L [US]); | [YA]EP0755850 (BODENSTEDT ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * page 4 - page 8; figures 1,5-8; claim 1 * [A] 7; | [Y]DE19811738 (LIEDL SIMON [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000135187 A 20000516 (TOSHIBA TEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US5467501 | US5561346 |