EP1130262 - Gear pump with flow capacity changing sliding unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voigt, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Harxbütteler Strasse 8 38110 Braunschweig / DE | [2001/36] | Application number, filing date | 01102128.4 | 01.02.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | DE2000143842 | 06.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10043842 | DE2000110039 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10010039 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130262 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130262 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | [2002/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130262 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/00 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
F04C14/185 (EP);
F04C2/088 (EP);
F04C2/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/36] | F04C15/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/36] | Title | German: | Zahnradpumpe mit einer fördermengenverändernden Verschiebeeinheit | [2007/29] | English: | Gear pump with flow capacity changing sliding unit | [2001/36] | French: | Pompe à engrenages avec dispositif glissant pour changer le débit | [2001/36] |
Former [2001/36] | Zahnradpumpe mit einer fördermengenverändernden Vershiebeeinheit | Examination procedure | 22.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.12.2007 | DK | 19.12.2007 | FI | 19.12.2007 | IE | 19.12.2007 | NL | 19.12.2007 | TR | 19.12.2007 | AT | 01.02.2008 | LU | 01.02.2008 | BE | 28.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | CH | 29.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | LI | 29.02.2008 | SE | 19.03.2008 | GR | 20.03.2008 | ES | 30.03.2008 | PT | 19.05.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
TR | 19.12.2007 | ||
AT | 01.02.2008 | ||
LU | 01.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
AT | 01.02.2008 | ||
LU | 01.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
AT | 01.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 19.12.2007 | |
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
AT | 01.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 19.12.2007 | |
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 19.12.2007 | |
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 19.12.2007 | |
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 19.12.2007 | |
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | FI | 19.12.2007 | |
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | FI | 19.12.2007 | |
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 19.12.2007 | |
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | SE | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB930913 (SERCK RADIATORS LTD) [A] 1,2,11* page 1, line 41 - page 2, line 16; figure . *; | [Y]FR1395842 (BOULANGER) [Y] 2,19,25 * page 1, column L, line 17 - page 2, column L, line 4; figure - *; | [XY]DE3347015 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1,13,16-18 * page 5, paragraph L - page 8, line 4 * * page 8, paragraph L - page 11, line L; figure . * [Y] 2,3; | [YA]DE3528651 (ROHS HANS GUENTHER PROF DR ING [DE]) [Y] 2,3,19,25 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 20; figures 1-10 * [A] 20-22 |