EP1126531 - Magnetoresistance effect device, and magnetoresistance effect type head, memory device, and amplifying device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakakima, Hiroshi 3-20-19, Kasumizaka, Tanabe-cho Tsuzuki-gun, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Irie, Yousuke 44-405 Tsurumaidanchi, Tsurumaihigashi-machi 1 Ban Nara-shi, Nara 631-0021 / JP | 03 /
Satomi, Mitsuo 6-52-4, Kisabe Katano-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Kawawake, Yasuhiro Lune-Uji, Nanryo-cho-minami 511, 34-1, Nishihata Ogura-cho, Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | [2001/38] |
Former [2001/34] | 01 /
Sakakima, Hiroshi 3-20-19, Kasumizaka, Tanabe-cho Tsuzuki-gun, Kyoto / JP | ||
02 /
Irie, Yousuke 25-3, Mido-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Satomi, Mitsuo 6-52-4, Kisabe Katano-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
04 /
Kawawake, Yasuhiro Lune-Uji, Nanryo-cho-minami 511, 34-1, Nishihata Ogura-cho, Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2001/34] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novapat International SA, 9, rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 01102181.3 | 02.05.1995 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | JP19940093257 | 02.05.1994 Original published format: JP 9325794 | JP19940125072 | 07.06.1994 Original published format: JP 12507294 | JP19940149229 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: JP 14922994 | JP19940176822 | 28.07.1994 Original published format: JP 17682294 | JP19940178078 | 29.07.1994 Original published format: JP 17807894 | JP19940187484 | 09.08.1994 Original published format: JP 18748494 | JP19940190457 | 12.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19045794 | JP19940303615 | 07.12.1994 Original published format: JP 30361594 | JP19940313147 | 16.12.1994 Original published format: JP 31314794 | JP19950053067 | 13.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5306795 | JP19950051630 | 10.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5163095 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1126531 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1126531 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L43/10, G11B5/39, G11C11/15, H03F15/00 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
H03F7/02 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G01R33/093 (EP,US);
G11B5/3903 (EP,US);
G11C11/161 (EP,US);
G11C11/1657 (EP,US);
G11C11/1673 (EP,US);
G11C11/1675 (EP,US);
G11C11/5607 (EP,US);
H01F10/3281 (EP,US);
H10B61/00 (EP,US);
H10N50/85 (EP,US);
G11B2005/3996 (EP,US);
G11B5/3925 (EP,US);
G11C2211/5616 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/34] | Title | German: | Magnetowiderstandseffektvorrichtung und hiermit versehener Magnetkopf, Speicher- und Verstärkungsanordnung | [2001/34] | English: | Magnetoresistance effect device, and magnetoresistance effect type head, memory device, and amplifying device using the same | [2001/34] | French: | Dispositif à magnétorésistance et tête à effet de magnétorésistance, dispositif de mémoire et amplificateur utilisant ce dispositif | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 06.07.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/25] | 27.01.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95106589.5 / EP0681338 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JPH06122963 ; | [A]US3382448 (OBERG PAUL E, et al) [A] 28 * abstract *; | [A]EP0498344 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5,6,9,10,12,24 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2677811 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE LAB [FR]) [A] 1,10,11 * claim - *; | [A]US5173873 (WU JIIN-CHUAN [US], et al) [A] 1,25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0548841 (TDK CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10,12,24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0578196 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6,9-12 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 36 * * page 5, line 7 - line 10; figure - *; | [A]EP0594243 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-8,10-12,24 * page 3, line 7 - line 36 * * page 4, line 14 - line 36 * * figure - *; | [PX]EP0613148 (IBM [US]) [PX] 25 * the whole document *; | [E]US5514452 (ARAKI SATORU [JP], et al) [E] 1,5,6,9 * claim - *; | [A] - PRATT W P ET AL, "GIANT MAGNETORESISTANCE WITH CURRENT PERPENDICULAR TO THE MULTILAYER PLANES", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, (19930901), vol. 126, no. 1 - 03, pages 406 - 409, XP000395821 [A] 1,23 * page 406, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-8853(93)90639-J | [A] - MCGUIRE T R ET AL, "MAGNETORESISTANCE AND MAGNETIC PROPERTIES OF CO/CU/CO SANDWICH FILM WITH THIN CO LAYER INSERT", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19930515), vol. 73, no. 10 PART 02A, page 5541, XP000381186 [A] 1,12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.353643 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940804), vol. 18, no. 415, Database accession no. (C - 1233), & JP06122963 A 19940506 (TDK CORP) [PX] 1,5,6,9 * abstract * |