EP1122689 - Method for the enhancement of digital images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AgfaPhoto GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2005/10] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fürsich, Manfred, Dr. Hainbuchenstrasse 53 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 02 /
Damm, Tobias, Dr. Karolingerallee 10 81545 München / DE | 03 /
Taresch, Gudrun, Dr. Thalkirchener Strasse 66 80337 München / DE | 04 /
Schuhrke, Thomas, Dr. Alzstrasse 17 81549 München / DE | 05 /
Oberhardt, Knut Eichenweg 2 83607 Föching / DE | [2001/32] | Application number, filing date | 01102473.4 | 03.02.2001 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | DE2000104631 | 03.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10004631 | [2001/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1122689 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1122689 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T5/20, H04N1/58 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
G06T5/75 (EP);
G06T2207/10008 (EP);
G06T2207/20008 (EP);
G06T2207/20192 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/32] | G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbesserung digitaler Bilder | [2001/32] | English: | Method for the enhancement of digital images | [2001/32] | French: | Méthode d'amélioration d'images numériques | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.01.2006 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2006/17] | 01.04.2010 | Resumption of proceedings | [2009/45] | 01.01.2006 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2009/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5523849 (JAMZADEH FERAYDOON S [US]) [X] 1-4,7-20 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - line 40 * * column 7, line 15 - line 44 * * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 46 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 5,6; | [YA]EP0726672 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,6 * figures 1,4,24 * [A] 1-4,6-20; | [A] - KLETTE R., ZAMPERONI P., Handbook of Image Processing Operators, page 355 - 359, CHICESTER, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1996), XP002252568 [A] 3,4 * page 356, paragraph 7.3.1 * | [A] - AGFA, "Technical DATA AF, 1st edition AGFA RANGE OF FILMS", AGFA GAEVERTAG, ANWENDUNGSTECHNIK PHOTO, (199809), no. 1, pages 1 - 8, XP002252567 [A] 2 * page 2 * |