EP1133046 - Multipolar magnet type generator for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moriyama Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1450-6 Mori, Mori-machi, Shuuchi-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2001/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asaeda, Shiro, c/oMoriyama Kogyo K.K. 1450-6 Mori, Mori-machi Shuuchi-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Anma, Tatsuya, c/oMoriyama Kogyo K.K. 1450-6 Mori, Mori-machi Shuuchi-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Hideaki, c/oMoriyama Kogyo K.K. 1450-6 Mori, Mori-machi Shuuchi-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/37] | Böckelen, Rainer Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01102975.8 | 08.02.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | JP20000057321 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000057321 | US20010778338 | 07.02.2001 Original published format: US 778338 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1133046 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1133046 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/22, H02K1/14, H02K15/02 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
H02K1/146 (EP);
H02K21/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2002/46] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Generator mit mehrpoliger magnetischer Erregung für Verbrennungskraftmaschinen | [2001/37] | English: | Multipolar magnet type generator for internal combustion engines | [2001/37] | French: | Générateur à magnétisation multipolaire pour les moteurs à combustion interne | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 14.12.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4146806 (KATSUMATA MITSUO) [A] 3,4,9,10* column 2, lines 19-53; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]DE3408563 (KIENLE & SPIESS STANZ & DRUCK [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 19, paragraph 1; figures 1-14 * [A] 6,11; | [XA]US4900636 (TAKENOUCHI SYOISHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 48; figures 1-4 * [A] 6,11; | [XA]US4979285 (MARTIN BENSON D [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 13; figures 1-6 * [A] 6,11; | [XA]US5142178 (KLOSTER GERALD G [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 37; figures 1,2 * [A] 6,11; | [XA]US5338996 (YAMAMOTO KYOHEI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column A * * column 3, lines 12-54; figures 1,2 * [A] 6,11; | [XA]US5923112 (BERTOCCHI GIANLUCA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-4 * [A] 6,11; | [XA]US6002191 (SABAN DANIEL M [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 62; figures 1-9 * [A] 6,11 |