EP1142840 - Glass for cathode-ray tube, strengthened glass, method for the production thereof and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5, Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-0032 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Hoya Corporation 7-5, Naka-Ochiai 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 161-0032 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hachitani, Yoichi 2196-260, Hirai Hinodemachi Nishitamagun, Tokyo 190-0182 / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103534.2 | 16.02.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | JP20000039096 | 17.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000039096 | JP20000165917 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000165917 | JP20000166574 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000166574 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1142840 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1142840 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/062, C03C3/095, C03C21/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C03C21/002 (EP,US);
C03C3/04 (KR);
C03C3/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/01] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Glas für eine Kathodenstrahlröhre, verstärktes Glas, seine Verwendung und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2001/41] | English: | Glass for cathode-ray tube, strengthened glass, method for the production thereof and use thereof | [2001/41] | French: | Verre pour tube cathodique, verre renforcé, sa méthode de production et son utilisation | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 09.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/35] | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05221685 ; | [A]JPS57126050 ; | [A]DE19802919 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,8,10-13,15-21 * abstract * * example 1; table 1 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 39, Database accession no. 1993-308975, XP002182653 & JPH05221685 A 19930831 (NAKASHIMA KK) [A] 1-3,7,8,10-13,15-21 * abstract * * example 2; table . * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 37, Database accession no. 1982-44023E, XP002182654 & JPS57126050 A 19820805 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS) [A] 1-3,7,8,10-13,15-21 * abstract * * example 4; table . * | by applicant | JPS5927729B | JPS50105705 | JPH07108797B |