EP1110802 - Electric motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | For all designated states TOKYO R&D CO., LTD. 3-10-23, Motoazabu Minato-ku Tokyo 106 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0811 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOKYO R&D CO., LTD. 3-10-23, Motoazabu Minato-ku Tokyo 106 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tabata, Kunio Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Nobuki Tokyo R & D Co., Ltd., 4415-2, Shinyoshidacho Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | 03 /
Kozaki, Minoru Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 04 /
Yamakoshi, Issei Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 05 /
Takagi, Kunihiko Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 06 /
Koike, Yoshikazu Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 07 /
Mizukoshi, Atsushi Tokyo R & D Co., Ltd., 4415-2, Shinyoshidacho Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | 08 /
Sato, Takeo Tokyo R & D Co., Ltd., 4415-2, Shinyoshidacho Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103605.0 | 11.05.1993 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | JP19920119127 | 12.05.1992 Original published format: JP 11912792 | JP19920239695 | 08.09.1992 Original published format: JP 23969592 | JP19920239696 | 08.09.1992 Original published format: JP 23969692 | JP19920240912 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24091292 | JP19920240913 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24091392 | JP19920240914 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24091492 | JP19920240915 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24091592 | JP19920240916 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24091692 | JP19920240917 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24091792 | JP19920240918 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24091892 | JP19920240919 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24091992 | JP19920240920 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24092092 | JP19920240921 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24092192 | JP19920240922 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24092292 | JP19920254892 | 24.09.1992 Original published format: JP 25489292 | JP19920283720 | 29.09.1992 Original published format: JP 28372092 | JP19920283721 | 29.09.1992 Original published format: JP 28372192 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1110802 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1110802 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, B60L3/00 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
B62M7/00 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (KR);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
B60L3/00 (US);
B60L3/0023 (EP,US);
B60L3/003 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (EP,US);
B60L3/06 (EP,US);
B60L50/60 (EP,US);
B60L58/10 (EP,US);
B62M7/12 (EP,US);
H02K1/185 (EP,US);
H02K1/276 (EP,US);
H02K29/08 (EP,US);
B60G2204/30 (EP,US);
B60K1/00 (EP,US);
B60K17/043 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0046 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0061 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
B60L2220/44 (EP,US);
B60L2220/46 (EP,US);
B60L2260/56 (EP,US);
B62K2202/00 (EP,US);
B62K2204/00 (EP,US);
H02K15/04 (EP,US);
H02K2211/03 (EP,US);
H02K5/10 (EP,US);
H02K5/15 (EP,US);
H02K5/225 (EP,US);
H02K7/10 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/26] | B60L11/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/26] | Title | German: | Elektrofahrzeug | [2001/26] | English: | Electric motor vehicle | [2001/26] | French: | Véhicule électrique | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 28.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/22] | 05.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93911994.7 / EP0640507 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3921745 (MCCULLOCH ROBERT P, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |