EP1123957 - The use of melt-flowable materials for sealing surfaces or applying design elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/33] | Melt-flowable materials and method of sealing surfaces | ||
[2007/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Michael, A. MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO., 3M CENTER PO BOX 33427, SAINT PAUL, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Willett, Peggy, S. MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO., 3M CENTER PO BOX 33427, SAINT PAUL, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Tumey, Michael, L. MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO., 3M CENTER PO BOX 33427, SAINT PAUL, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
George, Clayton, A. MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO., 3M CENTER PO BOX 33427, SAINT PAUL, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
Itoh, Akira MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO., 3M CENTER PO BOX 33427, SAINT PAUL, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01103956.7 | 14.10.1994 | [2001/33] | Priority number, date | US19930150692 | 10.11.1993 Original published format: US 150692 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123957 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123957 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, C09J5/06, C08J5/12, B32B7/04, // B60R13/06 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
C08J5/12 (KR);
B32B27/04 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B7/04 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B60J10/34 (EP);
B60R13/04 (EP);
B60R13/06 (EP);
C08J5/121 (EP);
C09J5/06 (EP);
C09J7/00 (KR);
C09J7/22 (EP,US);
C09J7/38 (EP);
B32B2307/702 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2432/00 (US);
C09J2301/1242 (EP);
C09J2301/162 (EP);
C09J2400/226 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/33] | Title | German: | Verwendung von schmelzflüssige Materialien zum Versiegeln von Oberflächen oder applizieren von Design-Elementen | [2007/20] | English: | The use of melt-flowable materials for sealing surfaces or applying design elements | [2007/20] | French: | L'utilisation des matériaux pouvant être rendus coulants par fusion pour la protection de surfaces ou l'application des elements de dessins | [2007/20] |
Former [2001/33] | Schmelzflüssige Materialien und Verfahren zum Versiegeln von Oberflächen | ||
Former [2001/33] | Melt-flowable materials and method of sealing surfaces | ||
Former [2001/33] | Matériaux pouvant être rendus coulants par fusion et procédé de protection de surfaces | Examination procedure | 19.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2005 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94930100.6 / EP0729486 | EP98202739.3 / EP0881066 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.12.2007 | SE | 19.03.2008 | DE | 20.03.2008 | ES | 30.03.2008 | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/40] | BE | 19.12.2007 | |
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | SE | 19.03.2008 | |
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | SE | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS5342280 ; | [A]US3515615 (OKADA YOICHI, et al) [A] 1 * claim 13 *; | [A]EP0386909 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,23 * abstract *; | [D]US5086088 (KITANO SHUICHI [JP], et al); | [X]WO9208073 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,10-12,17,18 * abstract * * page 4, lines 5-25 * * page 5, lines 4-10 * * page 8, lines 26,27 *; | [AD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 22, Database accession no. 1978-39058A, XP002169519 & JPS5342280 A 19780417 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO) [AD] 1 * abstract * |