EP1149554 - Floor mat for indoor and outdoor use, in particular as composite structure for floor covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinz, Michael Lindenstrasse 21 35321 Laubach-Münster / DE | [2001/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Klaus-Dieter Fasanenstrasse 74 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Hoffmann, Klaus-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Kurfürstendamm 40-41 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104068.0 | 20.02.2001 | [2001/44] | Priority number, date | DE2000207218U | 19.04.2000 Original published format: DE 20007218 U | [2001/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1149554 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1149554 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149554 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47L23/26, E04F15/16 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
A47L23/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/44] | Title | German: | Fussmatte für Aussen- und Innenbereiche, insbesondere als Verbundkonstruktion für Bodenbelag | [2001/44] | English: | Floor mat for indoor and outdoor use, in particular as composite structure for floor covering | [2001/44] | French: | Paillasson pour utilisation à l'intérieur et à l'extérieur, notamment comme structure composite de revêtement de sol | [2001/44] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 03.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2003 | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | FR | 07.06.2006 | GB | 07.06.2006 | IE | 07.06.2006 | IT | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | ES | 18.09.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | AT | 20.02.2007 | LU | 20.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | CH | 28.02.2007 | LI | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
FR | 07.06.2006 | ||
GB | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 20.02.2007 | ||
LU | 20.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
FR | 07.06.2006 | ||
GB | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 20.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
GB | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 20.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
GB | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
GB | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
GB | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
GB | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
GB | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5190799 (ELLINGSON III CHESTER W [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 5 - line 9 * * column 3, line 46 - line 59; figure 3 *; | [A]DE9401006U (AHLMANN ACO SEVERIN [DE]) [A] 1* figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5486392 (GREEN EDWARD J [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 36 - line 40 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 15; figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO9934971 (SPECIALTIES CONST [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 13, paragraph 2; figure 3 * |