EP1132586 - Exhaust purifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Tsugio, K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Koga, Masahiro, K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Wakayama, Hirofumi, K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104364.3 | 23.02.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | JP20000063406 | 08.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000063406 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1132586 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1132586 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1132586 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/22, F01N3/34, F01N3/30 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
F01N3/30 (EP);
F01N3/22 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/37] | F01N3/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2004/04] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Abgasreiniger | [2001/37] | English: | Exhaust purifier | [2001/37] | French: | Purificateur de gaz d'échappement | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 14.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3863444 (NAKAJIMA YASUO, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 2 * * column 7, line 26 - line 40 * * column 9, line 3 - line 14 * * column 9, line 68 - column 10, line 19; figures 9,10 *; | [X]US4476676 (IKENOYA YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 27 - line 38 * * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 40 * * column 7, line 27 - line 35; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [XY]US4641619 (OKIMOTO HARUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 40 - line 64 * * column 5, line 34 - line 48; figure 1 * [Y] 3; | [Y]US5519992 (HOSOYA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 3* column 40, line 27 - column 41, line 6 * | by applicant | JPH05340240 |