EP1128092 - A method for automatically balancing belt tension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/35] | Belt power transmission device | ||
[2010/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bando Chemical Industries, Ltd. 2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-0883 / JP | [2011/15] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states BANDO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurose, Yoshitaka, c/o Bando Chemical Industries, Ltd. 2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP | [2011/15] |
Former [2001/35] | 01 /
Kurose, Yoshitaka, Bando Chemical Industries, Ltd. 2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104390.8 | 23.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | JP20000049772 | 25.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000049772 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1128092 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1128092 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1128092 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16H7/12 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
F16H7/1218 (EP,US);
F16H7/12 (KR);
F16H2007/081 (EP,US);
F16H2007/0893 (EP,US);
F16H2007/0897 (EP,US);
F16H7/0831 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/28] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Balancierung der Riemenspannung | [2010/47] | English: | A method for automatically balancing belt tension | [2010/47] | French: | Procédé d'équilibrage automatique de la tension d'une courroie | [2010/47] |
Former [2001/35] | Riementrieb zur Leistungsübertragung | ||
Former [2001/35] | Belt power transmission device | ||
Former [2001/35] | Transmission de puissance par courroie | Examination procedure | 14.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4006366 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [A] 1* claim 4 *; | [DA]EP0546825 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO0034684 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA]) [PA] 1 * figure 6 *; | [A] - NAWROCKI W T ET AL, "SIZING SPRING TENSIONERS FOR V-BELT DRIVES", MACHINE DESIGN, PENTON,INC. CLEVELAND, US, (19900111), vol. 62, no. 1, ISSN 0024-9114, page 132,134,136,13, XP000095637 [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH05164206 |