EP1134843 - Device for the plug-in connection of a cable to a vehicle battery terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc. 1105 North Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC. 1105 North Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kieninger, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Goldbergstrasse 45B 70372 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Andraschko, Rudolf Schellingstrasse 7 73655 Pluederhausen / DE | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104439.3 | 27.02.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | DE2000112387 | 14.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10012387 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134843 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134843 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R11/28 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
H01R11/282 (EP,US);
H01R13/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/38] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Steckverbindung eines Kabels an eine Motorfahrzeugbatterieklemme | [2001/38] | English: | Device for the plug-in connection of a cable to a vehicle battery terminal | [2001/38] | French: | Dispositif de connexion enfichable d'un cable à un terminal de batterie de véhicule à moteur | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/24] | 11.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04138663 ; | [Y]WO9719496 (SIHN JR KG WILHELM [DE], et al) [Y] 9-14 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2745123 (SOCOP SA [FR]) [Y] 1-7 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 27; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE29717896U (MECANISMOS AUX IND [ES]) [Y] 8,16 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 2; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5713765 (NUGENT STEVEN F [US]) [Y] 15* column 4, line 32 - column 4, line 67; figure 5 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920831), vol. 016, no. 412, Database accession no. (E - 1256), & JP04138663 A 19920513 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * |