EP1129736 - Ventricular-assist method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Levram Medical Devices, Ltd. Science Park-Technion Nesher 36601 / IL | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landesberg, Amir Technion City Haifa 32000 / IL | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Molnia, David, et al Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Frank-Molnia, David, et al Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104482.3 | 28.02.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | US20000517834 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: US 517834 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1129736 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10, A61N1/365, A61B8/06 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
A61M60/17 (EP);
A61M60/411 (US);
A61M60/178 (US);
A61M60/295 (EP);
A61M60/497 (EP);
A61M60/515 (EP,US);
A61M60/538 (EP,US);
A61M60/148 (US);
A61M60/274 (US);
A61M60/432 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/21] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gerät und Vorrichtung zur Unterstützung der Funktion einer Herzkammer | [2001/36] | English: | Ventricular-assist method and apparatus | [2001/36] | French: | Méthode et Dispositif d'assistance ventriculaire | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/46] | 01.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4685446 (CHOY DANIEL S J [US]) [A] 21* column 6, lines 23-48; figure 17 *; | [A]US4771765 (CHOY DANIEL S J [US], et al) [A] 10,22 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 62; figures 22,25 * * column 6, lines 52-62 * * column 9, lines 21-24 * * column 10, lines 3-18 * * column 11, lines 28-67 * * column 13, line 48 - column 14, line 17 *; | [A]US4969864 (SCHWARZMANN FRANK [US], et al) [A] 10 * column 2, lines 5-65 * * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 3 * * column 6, lines 44-61 *; | [A]WO9528974 (MAUGERI BRUNO [IT], et al) [A] 19 * abstract * * page 7, lines 3-11 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 7 *; | [A]WO9806454 (PACESETTER AB [SE], et al) [A] 10,11,20 * page 3 - page 6 * * figure 1 * |