EP1134561 - Optical volume sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ascensia Diabetes Care Holdings AG Peter-Merian Strasse 90 4052 Basel / CH | [2016/36] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 100 Bayer Boulevard Whippany, NJ 07981-0915 / US | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dosmann, Andrew J. 50607 Cherry Road Granger, IN 46530 / US | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/19] |
Former [2013/51] | BIP Patents, et al c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Linhart, Angela, et al Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing Building Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2009/22] | Linhart, Angela, et al Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Burkert, Frank, et al Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104494.8 | 01.03.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | US20000523716 | 13.03.2000 Original published format: US 523716 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134561 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134561 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1134561 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/15, A61B5/1455, G01F17/00 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
G01F17/00 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/15186 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
G01N21/8483 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/31] | G01F17/00, G01B11/00, A61B5/14, A61B5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2001/38] | G01F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Volumenssensor | [2001/38] | English: | Optical volume sensor | [2001/38] | French: | Capteur optique de volume | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2015 | 17.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10181948.0 / EP2293028 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2016 | BE | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | ES | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | IT | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | NL | 11.05.2016 | SE | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
NL | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2087550 (FISH FARM DEV LTD) [X] 1,4,18,21,31,58,71 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1,2 * [A] 45; | [A]US5279294 (ANDERSON PAUL J [US], et al) [A] 45* abstract * |