EP1132138 - Document shredder with a top for receiving and feeding documents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schwelling, Hermann Hartmannweg 5 88682 Salem / DE | [2001/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Fürst, Siegfried Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kanzlei "Region Göppingen" Postfach 10 22 73010 Göppingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Fürst, Siegfried Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann & Vogeser Nördliche Ringstrasse 10 73033 Göppingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104652.1 | 24.02.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | DE2000108757 | 24.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10008757 | [2001/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1132138 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1132138 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/00, B02C18/22 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
B02C18/2275 (EP);
B02C18/0007 (EP);
B02C2018/0046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/23] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Aktenvernichter mit einem Aufsatz zur Aufnahme und Zuführung von Schriftgut | [2001/37] | English: | Document shredder with a top for receiving and feeding documents | [2001/37] | French: | Destructeur de documents ayant un dessus pour la réception et l'alimentation de documents | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 09.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.02.2006 | GB | 01.02.2006 | IT | 01.02.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | GB | 01.02.2006 | |
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
FR | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | GB | 01.02.2006 | |
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | GB | 01.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE2335344 (SCHLEICHER CO FEINWERKTECH) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,8-10; | [YA]GB2095579 (SCHWELLING HERMANN) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,8-10; | [YA]DE4011670 (POETTINGER ALOIS LANDMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7 * figures 1-3; claims 1,4,5,8-10 * [A] 3,5,8-10; | [A]US5871162 (RAJEWSKI ROBERT C [CA]) [A] 3,5* figure 5; claim 1 * |