EP1129958 - Swing-stopper bottle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flensburger Brauerei Emil Petersen GmbH & Co. KG Munketoft 12 24937 Flensburg / DE | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauer, Werner Munketoft 12 24937 Flensburg / DE | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Kunz, Herbert, et al Hammonds LLP Karl-Scharnagl-Ring 7 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Kunz, Herbert, et al Hammonds LLP Karl-Scharnagl-Ring 7 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Kunz, Herbert, Dr., et al Hammonds Rechtsanwälte/Patentanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 17 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/36] | Mahler, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. White & Case,Feddersen, Jungfernstieg 51 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104699.2 | 26.02.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | DE2000109939 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10009939 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1129958 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1129958 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D45/06 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
B65D45/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/04] |
Former [2005/01] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bügelverschlussflasche | [2001/36] | English: | Swing-stopper bottle | [2001/36] | French: | Fermeture à étrier pour bouteille | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/03] | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE726361 (OTTO HARTMANN) [A] 1-10* figure 1 *; | [A]US3770160 (FLIDER F) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 27 - line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]US4893724 (SCHIEMANN WOLFRAM [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB2254070 (YAWL SPRING MINERAL WATER COMP [GB]) [X] 1,3 * page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4112610 (BRANSON ULTRASCHALL [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 6 - line 14 *; | [A]EP0549987 (TUBEX GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * figures 12,13; claim 10 * |