EP1132985 - Positive electrode material for nonaqueous electrolyte secondary battery and battery using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munakata, Fumio 15-22-303, Nishi-cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0007 / JP | 02 /
Fukuzawa, Tatsuhiro E-109, 3-68, Oppamahigashi-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-0063 / JP | 03 /
Ohsawa, Yasuhiko 3-68-9, Kamoi Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0813 / JP | 04 /
Tanjo, Yuuji 3-3-1-601, Kuriki, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0041 / JP | 05 /
Mihara, Takuya, c/o Seimi Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-10, Chigasaki 3-chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253-8585 / JP | 06 /
Kimura, Takashi, c/o Seimi Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-10, Chigasaki 3-chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253-8585 / JP | 07 /
Sunahara, Kazuo, c/o Seimi Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-10, Chigasaki 3-chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253-8585 / JP | 08 /
Suhara, Manabu, c/o Seimi Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-10, Chigasaki 3-chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253-8585 / JP | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104733.9 | 26.02.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | JP20000058104 | 03.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000058104 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1132985 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1132985 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/50 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/30] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Positives aktives Material für Verwendung nichtwässriger Elektrolyten enthaltende Sekündarbatterie und eine dieses verwendende Sekündarbatterie | [2001/37] | English: | Positive electrode material for nonaqueous electrolyte secondary battery and battery using the same | [2001/37] | French: | Matière active positive pour utilisation dans une pile secondaire à electrolyte non-aqueux et pile l'utilisant | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JP2000133266 ; | [PX]JP2000149943 ; | [PX]JP2000203844 ; | [X]JPH11317226 ; | [X]JPH11302018 ; | [X]JPH11317225 ; | [X]JPH08138669 ; | [X]JPH08190907 ; | [X]US5531920 (MAO ZHENHAU [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,17,18 * example 2 * * claim - * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000133266 A 20000512 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [PX] 1-4,6,8-10,12-18 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000149943 A 20000530 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV LAB INC) [PX] 1-4,6,7,17,18 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000203844 A 20000725 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV LAB INC) [PX] 1-4,7,17,18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11317226 A 19991116 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11302018 A 19991102 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11317225 A 19991116 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-4,6,7,17,18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08138669 A 19960531 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,12-18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08190907 A 19960723 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,12-18 * abstract * |