EP1182393 - Detachable pipe connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Fischer Rohrleitungssysteme AG Ebnatstrasse 111 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [2002/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grün, Harald Im Tal 4 78244 Gottmadingen / DE | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [2009/49] |
Former [2002/09] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Georg Fischer AG, Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 01104854.3 | 28.02.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | DE2000141556 | 24.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10041556 | [2002/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1182393 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1182393 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/00 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
F16L23/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/09] | Title | German: | Lösbare Rohrverbindungsanordnung | [2002/09] | English: | Detachable pipe connection | [2002/09] | French: | Raccord de tuyaux démontable | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.12.2004 | FR | 22.12.2004 | GB | 22.12.2004 | IE | 22.12.2004 | IT | 22.12.2004 | NL | 22.12.2004 | TR | 22.12.2004 | AT | 28.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | CH | 28.02.2005 | CY | 28.02.2005 | LI | 28.02.2005 | LU | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | DK | 22.03.2005 | GR | 22.03.2005 | SE | 22.03.2005 | ES | 02.04.2005 | PT | 22.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
FR | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
IT | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
TR | 22.12.2004 | ||
AT | 28.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
CY | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
LU | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
SE | 22.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
FR | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
TR | 22.12.2004 | ||
AT | 28.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
CY | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
LU | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
SE | 22.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
FR | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
TR | 22.12.2004 | ||
AT | 28.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
LU | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
SE | 22.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
FR | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
TR | 22.12.2004 | ||
AT | 28.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
FR | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
AT | 28.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
FR | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1481812 (FISCHER AG GEORG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0396151 (PLATZER SCHWEDENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, lines 1-5 * * column 2, lines 10-39 * * column 5, lines 18-21 * * figures 1,2,5,10,11 *; | [AD]US5837180 (LINDER JAMES C [US], et al) [AD] 1* abstract * |