EP1152417 - Electron beam irradiation apparatus, electron beam irradiation method, original disk, stamper, and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aki, Yuichi c/o Sony Corp., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Takao c/o Sony Corp., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takeda, Minoru c/o Sony Corp., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Masanobu c/o Sony Corp., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Masuhara, Shin c/o Sony Corp., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Kashiwagi, Toshiyuki c/o Sony Corp., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104999.6 | 01.03.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | JP20000057374 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000057374 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152417 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1152417 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/00, G11B7/26, H01J37/30, H01J37/301, H01J37/18, H01J37/317 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
G11B7/261 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (KR);
G11B23/0057 (EP,US);
H01J37/301 (EP,US);
H01J2237/188 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2002/33] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektronenstrahl-Bestrahlungs-Vorrichtung und -Verfahren, Originalplatte, Matrize und Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2001/45] | English: | Electron beam irradiation apparatus, electron beam irradiation method, original disk, stamper, and recording medium | [2001/45] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'irradiation avec un faisceau d'électrons, original disque,matrice de pressage et support d'enregistrement | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 08.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 26.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0312066 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 32 * * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 30; figures 1-7 * [Y] 5,10-13,3,4,8,9; | [XY]EP0384754 (MICRION CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * * column 1, lines 8-20 * * column 2, lines 6-13 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 7 * * column 5, lines 23-34 * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 12; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,10-13; | [XY]US4584479 (LAMATTINA JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * * column 7, line 4 - column 10, line 57; figures 1-10 * [Y] 5,10-13; | [XY]US4607167 (PETRIC PAUL F [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * * column 1, lines 12-57 * * column 9, line 41 - column 10, line 10; figures 1-8 * * column 2, lines 42-45 * [Y] 5,10-13; | [Y]EP0324436 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [Y] 3,4,8,9 * column 1, lines 9-12 * * column 5, lines 17-39 * * column 7, lines 6-26 * * column 10, lines 8-37 *; | [Y]EP0936368 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 3,4,8,9 * column 1, lines 11-39 *; | [Y]EP0185097 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,10,12 * the whole document * * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 21; figures 1-5 *; | [XY]JPS6066347 ; | [DY]JPH11328750 ; | [Y]JPH11288530 ; | [Y]JPH11288535 ; | [Y]JPH0312838 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850821), vol. 009, no. 203, Database accession no. (P - 381), & JP60066347 A 19850416 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,10,11,13 | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11328750 A 19991130 (SONY CORP) [DY] 5,10,11,13 * abstract * * figures 1-18 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11288530 A 19991019 (SONY CORP) [Y] 5,10,11,13 * abstract * * figures 1-12 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11288535 A 19991019 (SONY CORP) [Y] 3,4,8,9 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910327), vol. 015, no. 127, Database accession no. (P - 1185), & JP03012838 A 19910121 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [Y] 5,10,11,13 * abstract * |