EP1134719 - Image display device and drive method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do, 446-711 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kota, Atsushi c/o NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Yuji c/o NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kawashima, Shingo c/o NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Nishigaki, Eitaro c/o NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/22] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen D., Dipl.-Ing. Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig, Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01105115.8 | 02.03.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | JP20000076903 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000076903 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1134719 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
G09G3/3216 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G09G2310/0205 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0221 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0283 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0414 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/23] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bildanzeigevorrichtung und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2001/38] | English: | Image display device and drive method thereof | [2001/38] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage d'images et sa méthode de commande | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 05.08.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/20] | Appeal following examination | 08.10.2008 | Appeal received No. T2043/08 | 08.10.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.04.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4935670 (WATANABE HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 57 *; | [A]US5032832 (CLERC JEAN-FREDERIC [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 27 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 7 *; | [A]US5754160 (SHIMIZU MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 18 ** column 10, line 42 - column 11, line 32 * | Examination | EP0784305 | US5874933 | US5923309 | JP2000029432 | by applicant | US5874933 | JP2000029432 |