EP1136487 - Nicotine salts with improved taste, process for their preparation and use thereof as smoking cessation agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nutrinova Nutrition Specialties & Food Ingredients GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Nutrinova Nutrition Specialties & Food Ingredients GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgard, Andreas, Dr. Hortensienring 18 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Dörr, Margit Kirchstrasse 3 67591 Hohen-Sülzen / DE | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/36] | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2001/39] | Schweitzer, Klaus, Dr., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01105450.9 | 14.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | DE2000113712 | 20.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10013712 | [2001/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136487 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136487 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D291/06, C07D275/06, A23L1/236, A61K31/4427, A61K9/00, A61K31/54, A24B15/00 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
C07D275/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/34 (EP);
C07D291/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2005/10] |
Former [2002/24] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL | ||
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Nikotinsalze mit verbessertem Geschmack, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Antirauchmittel | [2001/39] | English: | Nicotine salts with improved taste, process for their preparation and use thereof as smoking cessation agents | [2001/39] | French: | Sels de la nicotine, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme agents pour la cessation de fumer | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 09.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5488962 (PERFETTI GEORGIO [IT]) [AD] 1,8,9 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9741843 (AVANT GARDE TECHNOLOGIES & PRO [CH]) [AD] 1,8,9 * claim 12 *; | [AD]WO9904822 (CHINOIN GYOGYSZER ES VEGYESZET [HU], et al) [AD] 1,8,9 * example -; claims 1,23 *; | [AD]WO0012067 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [AD] 1,8,9 * claims 1,2 *; | BE899037 [ ] (TRENKER ADY); | [AP]WO0035296 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US], et al) [AP] 1,8,9 * claims 2,6,13 * | [A] - TRENKER, ADY, "Sucking composition for stopping smoking", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19841105), vol. 101, no. 19, Database accession no. 167543, XP002170271 [A] 1,8,9 * abstract * |