EP1154226 - Procedure and device for measuring of thickness and unroundness of elongated objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAP GmbH Laser Applikationen Zeppelinstrasse 23 D-21337 Lüneburg / DE | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Karsten Barskamper Weg 46 21354 Bleckede / DE | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2017/03] |
Former [2007/15] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Graalfs, Edo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, et al Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01105634.8 | 07.03.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | DE20001023172 | 11.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10023172 | [2001/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1154226 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1154226 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154226 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1154226 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | [2006/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1154226 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, G01B11/10, G01B11/255, B21B38/04 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
G01B11/2433 (EP,US);
G01B11/105 (EP,US);
G01B11/245 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | G01B11/24, G01B11/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2017/03] |
Former [2003/04] | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI | ||
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Messung der Dicke und Unrundheit von länglichen Werkstücken | [2001/46] | English: | Procedure and device for measuring of thickness and unroundness of elongated objects | [2001/46] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer l'épaisseur et l'excentricité d'objets longitudinaux | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 06.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2006
10.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE ZUMBACH ELECTRONIC AG Hauptstrasse 93 2552 Orpund / CH Opponent's representative Köster, Hajo, et al, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2006
10.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE ZUMBACH ELECTRONIC AG Hauptstrasse 93 2552 Orpund / CH Opponent's representative Köster, Hajo, et al, et al Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2006
10.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE ZUMBACH ELECTRONIC AG Hauptstrasse 93 CH-2552 Orpund / CH Opponent's representative Köster, Hajo, et al, et al propindus Patentanwälte Niedmers Jaeger Köster Pippinplatz 4a 82131 Gauting / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2006
10.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE ZUMBACH ELECTRONIC AG Hauptstrasse 93 CH-2552 Orpund / CH Opponent's representative Köster, Hajo, et al, et al propindus Patentanwälte NIEDMERS JAEGER KÖSTER Pippinplatz 4a 82131 Gauting b. München / DE | 14.11.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.12.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.06.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.12.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 18.08.2011 | Appeal received No. T1878/11 | 19.10.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.06.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 11.09.2008 | Appeal received No. T1794/08 | 09.12.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.11.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 26.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 23.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.06.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 04.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH036407 ; | [X]JPS56117107 ; | [A]JPS58131503 ; | [A]JPH10260270 ; | [A]JPS60253907 ; | [A]US4121292 (GALANIS TOM L, et al) [A] 9* abstract *; | [X]US4264208 (HABERL RAINER, et al) [X] 1,4,11 * column 11, line 43 - column 12, line 30; figures 4-6 *; | [X]GB2121956 (RICHTER BRUNO DIPL ING FA) [X] 9 * page 2, line 88 - page 3, line 40; figure 2 *; | [X]US5028798 (BISWAS AMIT K [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,11 * column 3, line 25 - line 60; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4037383 (MESACON MESSTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,3,11 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0843156 (LASER APPLIKATIONAN GMBH [DE]) [AD] 9,12 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910320), vol. 015, no. 116, Database accession no. (P - 1182), & JP03006407 A 19910111 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1,4,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811205), vol. 005, no. 191, Database accession no. (P - 092), & JP56117107 A 19810914 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [X] 5-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831029), vol. 007, no. 245, Database accession no. (P - 233), & JP58131503 A 19830805 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU KK) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10260270 A 19980929 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO INC:THE;HITACHI CABLE LTD) [A] 5-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860516), vol. 010, no. 132, Database accession no. (P - 456), & JP60253907 A 19851214 (DAIDO TOKUSHUKO KK) [A] 9 * abstract * |