EP1136481 - 1,2-Substituted 2,3-dihydro-1H-5,9-dioxacyclohepta[f]inden-7-ones and 7-substituted benzo[b][1,4]dioxepin-3-ones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier / CH | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraft, Philip Kirchbachstrasse 4 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 01105987.0 | 10.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | CH20000000557 | 23.03.2000 Original published format: CH 5572000 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136481 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136481 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D321/10, C11B9/00, A61K7/32 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
C11B9/0084 (EP,US);
C07D321/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | 1,2-Substituierte 2,3-dihydro-1H-5,9-dioxacyclohepta(f)inden-7-one und 7-substituierte Benzo(b)[1,4]dioxepin-3-one | [2001/39] | English: | 1,2-Substituted 2,3-dihydro-1H-5,9-dioxacyclohepta[f]inden-7-ones and 7-substituted benzo[b][1,4]dioxepin-3-ones | [2001/39] | French: | 2,3-dihydro-1H-5,9-dioxacyclohepta(f)indene-7-ones 1,2-substitués et benzo(b)[1,4]dioxepines-3-ones 7 substituées | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 10.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.11.2002 | BE | 13.11.2002 | FI | 13.11.2002 | GR | 13.11.2002 | TR | 13.11.2002 | DK | 13.02.2003 | PT | 13.02.2003 | SE | 13.02.2003 | CY | 10.03.2003 | IE | 10.03.2003 | LU | 10.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
BE | 13.11.2002 | ||
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
TR | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
CY | 10.03.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
LU | 10.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
BE | 13.11.2002 | ||
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
CY | 10.03.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
LU | 10.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
BE | 13.11.2002 | ||
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
CY | 10.03.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
LU | 10.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
BE | 13.11.2002 | ||
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
LU | 10.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
BE | 13.11.2002 | ||
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
BE | 13.11.2002 | ||
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 13.11.2002 | |
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 13.02.2003 | |
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 13.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3517031 (BEEREBOO JOHN J, et al) [A] 1,2,6,7* column W *; | [DA]EP0902024 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]); | [A]US5990076 (GAUDIN JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * column 1 - column 8 * |