EP1142749 - Vehicle controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshino, Takahiro 5-87-61, Uraga-cho Yokosuka city, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Yuki J-508, 3-51-1, Noukendai, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Hans-Werner Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Schmitz, Hans-Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01106242.9 | 14.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | JP20000104497 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000104497 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1142749 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1142749 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1142749 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/12, B60K6/04 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
B60W20/00 (EP,US);
B60K6/46 (EP,US);
B60L15/2045 (EP,US);
B60L50/15 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0052 (EP);
B60W2710/081 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/41] | B60L11/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/41] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsteuerung | [2001/41] | English: | Vehicle controller | [2001/41] | French: | Commande pour un véhicule | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0698521 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0782941 (SMH MANAGEMENT SERVICES AG [CH]) [A] 1,6 * column 12, line 37 - line 55; figures 1,6 *; | [A]EP0830969 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * page 7, line 1 - line 9 * * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 55; figures 1,7 *; | [A]EP0943475 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]EP0962352 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9962735 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) | by applicant | JPH11172426 |