EP1111623 - Zirconium niobium tin alloys for nuclear fuel rods and structural parts for high burnup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Framatome ANP, Inc. 3315 Old Forest Road, P.O. Box 10935 Lynchburg Virginia 24506-0935 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Framatome ANP, Inc. 3315 Old Forest Road, P.O. Box 10935 Lynchburg, Virginia 24506-0935 / US | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Siemens Power Corporation 2101 Horn Rapids Road Richland, WA 99352-0130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Swam, Leonard F.P., Dr. 1974 Forest Avenue Richland, WA 99352 / US | 02 /
Garzarolli, Friedrich, Dr. Teplitzer Strasse 4 91315 Höchstadt / DE | 03 /
Ruhmann, Heinrich, Dr. Glatzer Strasse 11 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Heilein Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01106341.9 | 29.07.1998 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | US19970904366 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: US 904366 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1111623 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111623 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/07, C22C16/00, C22F1/18 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
G21C3/07 (EP,US);
C22C16/00 (EP,US);
C22F1/186 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2001/26] | Title | German: | Zirkonium-Niob-Zinn-Legierungen für Kernreaktorbrennstäbe und Bauteile, die einen hohen Abbrand ermöglichen | [2001/26] | English: | Zirconium niobium tin alloys for nuclear fuel rods and structural parts for high burnup | [2001/26] | French: | Alliages de zirconium-niobium-étain pour des barreaux de combustible nucléaire et des éléments structurels qui permettent un haut degré de combustion | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98114175.7 / EP0895247 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2001 | 31.07.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62207835 ; | [A]GB932336 (EURATOM) [A] 1-15 * column W *; | [A]US3121034 (KURT ANDERKO, et al) [A] 1-15 * column W *; | [A]US4000013 (MACEWEN STUART R, et al); | [A]US4212686 (ASHER RAYMOND C [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 22 *; | [A]US4649023 (SABOL GEORGE P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column A *; | [A]EP0353733 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2737335 (FRAMATOME SA [FR]) [A] * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880304), vol. 012, no. 070, & JP62207835 A 00000000 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] * abstract * |