EP1143560 - Circularly polarized wave antenna and communication device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawahata, Kasunari, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. (A170) Intel. Prop. Dept., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Shigekasu, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. (A170) Intel. Prop. Dept., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 03 /
Yuasa, Atsuyuki, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. (A170) Intel. Prop. Dept., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 04 /
Akiyama, Hisashi, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. (A170) Intel. Prop. Dept., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01106584.4 | 15.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | JP20000094051 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000094051 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143560 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143560 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/04, H01Q1/24 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0435 (EP,US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/37] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Antenne für zirkular polarisierte Wellen und Kommunikationsgerät mit einer derartigen Antenne | [2001/41] | English: | Circularly polarized wave antenna and communication device using the same | [2001/41] | French: | Antenne à polarisation circulaire et appareil de communication utilisant celle-ci | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4827271 (BERNEKING WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US5633646 (STRICKLAND PETER C [CA]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0920075 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [PX]GB2351392 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document * |