EP1111441 - Vertically-aligned (VA) liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Fujitsu Display Technologies Corporation 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeda, Arihiro Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Ohmuro, Katsufumi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Koike, Yoshio Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Kataoka, Shingo Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Sasaki, Takahiro Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Sasabayashi, Takashi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 07 /
Tsuda, Hideaki Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 08 /
Chida, Hideo Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 09 /
Ohashi, Makoto Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 10 /
Okamoto, Kenji Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 11 /
Yamaguchi, Hisashi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 12 /
Otani, Minoru Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 13 /
Morishige, Makoto Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 14 /
Furukawa, Noriaki Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 15 /
Kamada, Tsuyoshi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 16 /
Tanaka, Yoshinori Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 17 /
Hoshino, Atuyuki Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 18 /
Hayashi, Shougo Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 19 /
Takizawa, Hideaki Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 20 /
Kinjou, Takeshi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 21 /
Tachibanaki, Makoto Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 22 /
Imoto, Keiji Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 23 /
Hasegawa, Tadashi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 24 /
Yoshida, Hidefumi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 25 /
Inoue, Hiroyasu Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 26 /
Taniguchi, Yoji Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 27 /
Fujikawa, Tetsuya Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 28 /
Murata, Satoshi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 29 /
Sawasaki, Manabu Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 30 /
Hirota, Siro Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 31 /
Ikeda, Masahiro Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 32 /
Tashiro, Kunihiro Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 33 /
Tasaka, Yasutoshi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 34 /
Mayama, Takatoshi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 35 /
Tanuma, Seiji Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 36 /
Nakanishi, Yohei Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 37 /
Tanose, Tomonori Yonago Fujitsu Ltd., 650,Aza Otsukanoni,Sekishu-fu Yonago-shi, Tottori 689-3524 / JP | 38 /
Tsukao, Kouji Yonago Fujitsu Ltd., 650,Aza Otsukanoni,Sekishu-fu Yonago-shi, Tottori 689-3524 / JP | [2009/46] |
Former [2001/26] | 01 /
Takeda, Arihiro Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Ohmuro, Katsufumi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Koike, Yoshio Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Kataoka, Shingo Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Sasaki, Takahiro Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
06 /
Sasabayashi, Takashi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
07 /
Tsuda, Hideaki Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
08 /
Chida, Hideo Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
09 /
Ohashi, Makoto Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
10 /
Okamoto, Kenji Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
11 /
Yamaguchi, Hisashi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
12 /
Otani, Minoru Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
13 /
Morishige, Makoto Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
14 /
Furukawa, Noriaki Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
15 /
Kamada, Tsuyoshi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
16 /
Tanaka, Yoshinori Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
17 /
Hoshino, Atuyuki Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
18 /
Hayashi, Shougo Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
19 /
Takizawa, Hideaki Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
20 /
Kinjou, Takeshi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
21 /
Tachibanaki, Makoto Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
22 /
Imoto, Keiji Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
23 /
Hasegawa, Tadashi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
24 /
Yoshida, Hidefumi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
25 /
Inoue, Hiroyasu Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
26 /
Taniguchi, Yoji Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
27 /
Fujikawa, Tetsuya Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
28 /
Murata, Satoshi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
29 /
Sawasaki, Manabu Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
30 /
Hirota, Siro Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
31 /
Ikeda, Masahiro Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
32 /
Tashiro, Kunihiro Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
33 /
Tasaka, Yasutoshi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
34 /
Mayama, Takatoshi Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
35 /
Tanuma, Seijo Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
36 /
Nakanishi, Yohei Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
37 /
Tanose, Tomonori Yonago Fujitsu Ltd., 650,Aza Otsukanoni,Sekishu-fu Yonago-shi, Tottori 689-3524 / JP | |||
38 /
Tsukao, Kouji Yonago Fujitsu Ltd., 650,Aza Otsukanoni,Sekishu-fu Yonago-shi, Tottori 689-3524 / JP | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01107303.8 | 11.06.1998 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | JP19970155437 | 12.06.1997 Original published format: JP 15543797 | JP19970230982 | 27.08.1997 Original published format: JP 23098297 | JP19970230991 | 27.08.1997 Original published format: JP 23099197 | JP19970266937 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26693797 | JP19970361384 | 26.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36138497 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111441 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111441 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111441 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
G02F1/133753 (EP,US);
G02F1/1337 (KR);
G02F1/133707 (EP,US);
G02F1/134336 (EP,US);
G02F1/1393 (EP,US);
G02F1/133388 (EP,US);
G02F1/133512 (EP,US);
G02F1/133514 (EP,US);
G02F1/134309 (EP,US);
G02F2413/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/15] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung mit vertikal ausgerichtetem Flüssigkristall | [2001/26] | English: | Vertically-aligned (VA) liquid crystal display device | [2001/26] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide d'orientation verticale | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98304649.1 / EP0884626 | Divisional application(s) | EP05023117.4 / EP1621923 | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP8292423 ; | [A]US5309264 (LIEN SHUI-CHIH A [US], et al) [A] 1,14,18,19,4,7 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 36 * * column 5, line 34 - line 50; figure 5 *; | [PX]US5673092 (HORIE WATARU [JP], et al) [PX] 1,4,5,13,18* column 11, line 32 - column 13, line 44; figure 10A *; | [E]EP0854377 (SHARP KK [JP]) [E] 1-4,13 * page 5, line 46 - line 50 * * page 18, line 18 - line 26; figure 15 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP7311383 A 19951128 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,14,18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP8292423 A 19961105 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1,4,5,13,18 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH07199193 | JPH07311383 | EP0854377 |