EP1147949 - Air bag module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive GmbH Industriestrasse 20 73553 Alfdorf / DE | [2004/28] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kolb, Klaus Achalmweg 19 73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107406.9 | 26.03.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | DE2000207141U | 18.04.2000 Original published format: DE 20007141 U | [2001/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1147949 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1147949 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1147949 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
B60R21/2176 (EP,US);
B60R21/213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/05] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gassackmodul | [2001/43] | English: | Air bag module | [2001/43] | French: | Module de sac de sécurité gonflable | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 09.11.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 28.02.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 15.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.12.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.07.2004 | [2005/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0978422 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US5772238 (BREED DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 12, line 38 - column 14, line 42; figure 2A *; | [X]WO9942334 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 5, lines 24-27; figure 4 *; | [DYA]EP0952044 (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [DY] 7,11,12 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 31; figures 5,6 * [A] 9; | [YA]EP0965497 (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [Y] 7,11,12 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 32; figures 2A,2B * [A] 2; | [Y]WO9951457 (TRW REPA GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 11,12 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 29; figure 4 * | by applicant | EP0952044 |