EP1139427 - Semiconductor integrated circuit making use of standard cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72 Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72 Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umemoto, Yasunobu, Toshiba Corp. Intell.Prop.Div. 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sei, Toshikazu, Toshiba Corp. Intell.Prop.Div. 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Morimoto, Toshiki, Toshiba Corp. Intell.Prop.Div. 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Hiroaki, Toshiba Corp. Intell.Prop.Div. 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107445.7 | 27.03.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | JP20000087679 | 27.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000087679 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1139427 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1139427 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/118, H01L27/02, G06F17/50 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H01L27/11807 (EP,US);
H01L21/82 (KR);
H01L27/0211 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/40] | H01L27/118 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/10] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Integrierter Halbleiterschaltkreis mit Standardzellenverwendung | [2001/40] | English: | Semiconductor integrated circuit making use of standard cells | [2001/40] | French: | Circuit intégré à semi-conducteur employant des cellules du type standard | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 27.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS618969 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [A]US4884115 (MICHEL PETRA [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5219770 (SHIRATO TAKEHIDE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 16 - line 26 * * column 2, line 15 - line 19 * * column 2, line 40 - line 45 * * column 3, line 25 - line 64 *; | [Y]JPH07152796 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [Y]US5901065 (GURUSWAMY MOHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - column 7, line 67 *; | [XY]US5981987 (BRUNOLLI MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 8-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 30 - line 67 * [Y] 1-7; | [Y] - KRISHNA B ET AL, "Diffusion sharing across cell boundaries in cell based design", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 1996., IEEE 39TH MIDWEST SYMPOSIUM ON AMES, IA, USA 18-21 AUG. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19960818), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-3636-4, pages 349 - 352, XP010222891 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSCAS.1996.594170 | [A] - GURUSWAMY M ET AL, "CELLERITY: A Fully Automatic Layout Synthesis System For Standard Cell Libraries", PROCEEDINGS OF THE DESIGN AUTOMATION CONFERENCE. ANAHEIM, JUNE 9 - 13, 1997, NEW YORK, ACM, US, (19970609), vol. CONF. 34, ISBN 0-7803-4093-0, pages 327 - 332, XP010227603 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/266021.266126 |