EP1143436 - Information recording and reproduction apparatus, information recording and reproduction method and information signal source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Igami, Eiichi 7-12, Minoyama Ichinotani Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614-8289 / JP | 02 /
Takauchi, Kenji 2-38-7, Kozu Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0053 / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Hiroshi 4-3426, Gotenyamaminamicho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1193 / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107469.7 | 28.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | JP20000099789 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000099789 | JP20000099790 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000099790 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143436 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143436 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143436 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/12, G11B19/04, G11B7/00, G11B7/09 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
G11B19/04 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B19/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/41] | G11B19/12, G11B19/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/46] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnung- und - wiedergabegerät, Informationsaufzeichnung- und - wiedergabeverfahren und Informationssignalquelle dafür | [2001/41] | English: | Information recording and reproduction apparatus, information recording and reproduction method and information signal source | [2001/41] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction des données, méthode d'enregistrement et de reproduction des données et source de signal d'information pour ceux-ci | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 26.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 05.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH08153348 ; | [DA]JPH08180621 ; | [A]JPH08273284 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08153348 A 19960611 (SHARP CORP) [DA] 1,3 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08180621 A 19960712 (FUJITSU LTD) [DA] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08273284 A 19961018 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |