EP1138570 - A railway train braking control and communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAB WABCO S.p.A. Via Volvera, 51 I-10045 Piossasco (Torino) / IT | For all designated states Alstom 25, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [2004/16] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states SAB WABCO S.p.A. Via Volvera, 51 I-10045 Piossasco (Torino) / IT | ||
For all designated states Alstom 25 avenue Kleber 75116 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states SAB WABCO S.p.A. Via Volvera, 51 I-10045 Piossasco (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barberis, Dario Corso Unione Sovietica 155 10134 Torino / IT | 02 /
Tione, Roberto Via Garibaldi 4 10020 Lauriano ( TO ) / IT | 03 /
Birot, Eric 11 Boulevard du Temple 75003 Paris / FR | 04 /
Coulange, Christian 24 rue des Tulipes 69680 Chassieu / FR | 05 /
Gallavardin, Daniel 23 rue Alfred Brinon 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 06 /
Ouzounis, Dionisios 19C rue Philippe Gonnard 69001 Lyon / FR | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 01107688.2 | 28.03.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | IT2000TO00302 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: IT TO000302 | [2001/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1138570 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1138570 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1138570 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1138570 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B61H13/00, B60T13/66, B60T17/22 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B61L15/0036 (EP,US);
B60T13/665 (EP,US);
B61L15/0081 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/40] | B61H13/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, SE [2003/39] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bremskontrol- und Kommunikationssystem in einem Eisenbahnzug | [2001/40] | English: | A railway train braking control and communication system | [2001/40] | French: | Système de communication et de contrôle du freinage pour un train | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 03.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | 30.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB292993 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3696758 (GODINEZ PETER A JR) [A] 1 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 18; figure - *; | [A]US3974435 (ELVIN STEN) [A] 1 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 32; figure - *; | [A]US5630565 (LUMBIS ANTHONY W [US]) [A] 1* column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 6; figure - *; | [A]US5808370 (BEZOS ANGEL P [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 28 - column 3, line 63; figure - *; | [AD]EP0976633 (SAB WABCO SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1,4 * abstract * |