EP1138556 - Bumper structure for automobile securing safety of pedestrians [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Kenichi Fuji Jukogyo K.K., 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | 02 /
Morimoto, Tatauya Fuji Jukogyo K.K., 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/40] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107693.2 | 28.03.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | JP20000092776 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000092776 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1138556 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1138556 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/12, B60R21/34 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
B60R21/34 (EP,US);
B60R19/12 (EP,US);
B60R2019/186 (EP,US);
B60R2021/343 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/01] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugstossfänger-Struktur zum Schutz von Fussgängern | [2001/40] | English: | Bumper structure for automobile securing safety of pedestrians | [2001/40] | French: | Structure de pare-chocs pour automobile assurant la sécurité des piétons | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 27.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 04.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 05.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH1178734 ; | [DY]JPH1178732 ; | [Y]JPH11208389 ; | [Y]US2062315 (JANDUS HERBERT S, et al) [Y] 2,3 * page 2, lines 59-68; figure 3 *; | [X]FR2445783 (PEUGEOT) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 13-34 * * page 3, lines 17-24; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2322602 (LIN PAC MOULDINGS [GB]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1065108 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [PX] 1-3* page 8, lines 49-54; figures 1,2 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11078734 A 19990323 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2,3 | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11078732 A 19990323 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [DY] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11208389 A 19990803 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH1178732 |