EP1143570 - Floating panel mounted connector assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [2006/25] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grois, Igor 4010 Greenacre Drive Northbrook, IL 60062 / US | 02 /
Belenkiy, Yuriy 8655 Shermer Road Niles, IL 60714 / US | 03 /
Szilagyi, B. Daniel 1130 Hidden Spring Avenue Naperville, IL 60540 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108014.0 | 29.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | US20000541207 | 03.04.2000 Original published format: US 541207 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143570 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143570 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143570 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
G02B6/389 (EP,US);
G02B6/36 (KR);
G02B6/3893 (EP,US);
G02B6/3897 (EP,US);
G02B6/3821 (EP,US);
G02B6/3849 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/41] | H01R13/631, H01R13/627, H01R13/74 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/06] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung zur schwimmenden Montage eines elektrischen Verbinders an eine Leiterplatte | [2001/41] | English: | Floating panel mounted connector assembly | [2001/41] | French: | Dispositif pour le montage flottant d'un connecteur à un panneau | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5930426 (HARTING DIETMAR [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9-14,16,20,21 * column 3, line 57 - column 5, line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5788522 (KAMEYAMA ISAO [JP]) [X] 1,5,9,11,12,16,20 * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 26; figures 1,10 *; | [X]WO9857827 (UT AUTOMOTIVE DEARBORN INC [US]) [X] 1,11,12 * page 8, line 8 - page 10, line 16; figures 3,4 * |