EP1152558 - Radio receiver for the reception of frequency modulated radio signals and method for adjusting and testing a reception branch of the radio receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schetelig, Markus Imbuschstrasse 54 45731 Waltrop / DE | 02 /
Burgess, Paul Harmoniestrasse 4 44787 Bochum / DE | 03 /
Kefenbaum, Arno Hermannstrasse 2 45527 Hattingen / DE | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/45] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108030.6 | 29.03.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | DE20001018021 | 11.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10018021 | [2001/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152558 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/45] | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
H04B17/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Empfängeranordnung zum Empfangen frequenzmodulierter Funksignale sowie Verfahren zum Anpassen und Testen eines Empfangszweiges der Empfängeranordnung | [2001/45] | English: | Radio receiver for the reception of frequency modulated radio signals and method for adjusting and testing a reception branch of the radio receiver | [2001/45] | French: | Dispositif de réception de signaux radio modulés en fréquence et procédé pour ajuster et tester une branche de réception d'un tel dispositif | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/16] | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |