EP1130020 - Tropane-derivatives, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NeuroSearch A/S Pederstrupvej 93 2750 Ballerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states NEUROSEARCH A/S Pederstrupvej 93 2750 Ballerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheel-Krüger, Jörgen Ejbydalsvej 127 2600 Glostrup / DK | 02 /
Moldt, Peter Fuglevangsvej 8A 2960 Rungsted Kyst / DK | 03 /
Wätjen, Frank Boserupvej 7B 3520 Farum / DK | [2001/36] | Application number, filing date | 01108256.7 | 21.02.1997 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | DK19960000194 | 22.02.1996 Original published format: DK 19496 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1130020 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D451/02, A61K31/46 | [2001/36] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Title | German: | Tropanderivate und Ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [2001/36] | English: | Tropane-derivatives, their preparation and use | [2001/36] | French: | Dérivés de tropane et leur préparation et utilisation | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 23.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97903355.2 / EP0885220 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4281130 (CLARKE ROBERT L, et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]WO9309814 (RES TRIANGLE INST [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0604355 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0604354 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0604352 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9528401 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK], et al) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * |