EP1146773 - Electromagnetic sound generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd. 1-23-1, Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd. 1-23-1, Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi, Yamanashi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuwabara, Atsushi Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd, 1-23-1 Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi, Yamanashi-ken / JP | 02 /
Asahina, Masato Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd, 1-23-1 Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi, Yamanashi-ken / JP | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108532.1 | 04.04.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | JP20000108686 | 10.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000108686 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1146773 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1146773 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04R11/02 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
H04R11/00 (EP,US);
H04R7/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/26] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektromagnetischer Schallgenerator | [2001/42] | English: | Electromagnetic sound generator | [2001/42] | French: | Générateur électromagnétique de son | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/01] | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.05.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.05.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6023518 (KUWABARA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH10187160 ; | US6108432 [ ] (WATANABE SHIGEHISA [JP]) [ ] * column 4, line 15 - line 67; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10187160 A 19980714 (CITIZEN ELECTRON CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |