EP1157773 - Process and apparatus for joining the ends of metal strips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sundwig GmbH Stephanopeler Strasse 22 58675 Hemer / DE | For all designated states A.I. WELDERS LIMITED Seafield Road Inverness, IV1 1LZ Scotland / GB | [2006/36] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Sundwig GmbH Stephanopeler Strasse 22 58675 Hemer / DE | ||
For all designated states A.I. WELDERS LIMITED Seafield Road Inverness, IV1 1LZ, Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boguslawsky, Klaus Heidestrasse 19 b 58640 Iserlohn / DE | 02 /
MacKenzie, Ian Höhenweg 1 58706 Menden / DE | 03 /
Hunter, A.J. 1B Green Drive GB-Inverness IV2 4EX / GB | 04 /
Sherriffs, Neill 22 Cuthbert Road Culcabock, GB-Inverness IV2 3RU / GB | [2006/35] |
Former [2001/48] | 01 /
Boguslawsky, Klaus Heidesrasse 19 b 58640 Iserlohn / DE | ||
02 /
MacKenzie, Ian Höhenweg 1 58706 Menden / DE | |||
03 /
Hunter, A.J. 1B Green Drive GB-Inverness IV2 4EX / GB | |||
04 /
Sherriffs, Neill 22 Cuthbert Road Culcabock, GB-Inverness IV2 3RU / GB | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108538.8 | 05.04.2001 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | DE2000125159 | 23.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10025159 | [2001/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1157773 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1157773 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1157773 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1157773 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/00, B23K11/34, B23K33/00, B23K11/06, B21B15/00 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
B23K11/34 (EP);
B23K11/0073 (EP);
B23K11/02 (EP);
B23K2101/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/48] | B23K11/00, B23K11/34, B23K33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verbinden der Enden zweier Metallbänder | [2001/48] | English: | Process and apparatus for joining the ends of metal strips | [2001/48] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour relier les extrémités de deux bandes métalliques | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.09.2006 | GB | 06.09.2006 | IE | 06.09.2006 | IT | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | TR | 06.09.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | ES | 17.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | LU | 05.04.2007 | CH | 30.04.2007 | LI | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 06.09.2006 | |
GB | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
LU | 05.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | GB | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | GB | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | GB | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | GB | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | GB | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | IE | 06.09.2006 | |
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | IE | 06.09.2006 | |
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 06.09.2006 | |
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | ES | 17.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS59137106 ; | [YA]JPH05212549 ; | [YA]JPS60184483 ; | [Y]JPH0569151 ; | [A]US3313911 (SEELOFFF MELVIN M) [A] 1-15* column W *; | [YDA]US3504427 (SEELOFF MELVIN M) [YD] 3,7 * column 4, lines 23-27; figure 4 * [A] 11,14; | [XAY]GB1379994 (BRITISH FEDERAL WELDER) [X] 1,2,4-10,15 * page 1, columns 61-82 * * page 1, line 87 - page 2, line 35; figure - * [A] 11,14 [Y] 3,12,13 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841204), vol. 008, no. 263, Database accession no. (M - 342), & JP59137106 A 19840807 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,15 * abstract * [Y] 7 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931203), vol. 017, no. 651, Database accession no. (M - 1519), & JP05212549 A 19930824 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-8,10,12,13,15 * abstract * [A] | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860131), vol. 010, no. 025, Database accession no. (M - 450), & JP60184483 A 19850919 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [Y] 1-8,10,12,13,15 * abstract * [A] 9,11,14 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930720), vol. 017, no. 385, Database accession no. (M - 1448), & JP05069151 A 19930323 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [Y] 12,13 * abstract * |