EP1146130 - Magnesium injection agent and process for ferrous metal treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magnesium Technologies Corporation 4816 Brecksville Road, Suite 5 Richfield, OH 44286 / US | [2006/23] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Rossborough Manufacturing Co., L.P. 33565 Pin Oak Parkway Avon Lake, Ohio 44012-0038 / US | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states ROSSBOURUGH MANUFACTURING CO., L.P. 33565 PIN OAK PARKWAY AVON LAKE, OHIO 44010-0038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bieniosek, Thomas H. 8020 Spieth Road Litchfield, Ohio 44253 / US | 02 /
Fahey, Jerome P. 7653 Timber Springs D12 Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2001/42] | Schumacher, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al König-Palgen-Schumacher-Kluin Patentanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108564.4 | 05.04.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | US20000546017 | 10.04.2000 Original published format: US 546017 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1146130 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1146130 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1146130 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C21C1/02, C21C7/064, C21C1/10 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
C21C7/0037 (EP,US);
C21C1/105 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/42] | Title | German: | Magnesium enthaltendes Injektierungsmittel und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Eisen- und Stahlschmelzen | [2001/42] | English: | Magnesium injection agent and process for ferrous metal treatment | [2001/42] | French: | Agent d'injection à base du magnésium et procédé pour le traitement de la fonte et de l'acier en fusion | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 13.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.05.2007 | BE | 30.05.2007 | CH | 30.05.2007 | CY | 30.05.2007 | DK | 30.05.2007 | FI | 30.05.2007 | IT | 30.05.2007 | LI | 30.05.2007 | NL | 30.05.2007 | PT | 30.05.2007 | TR | 30.05.2007 | SE | 30.08.2007 | DE | 31.08.2007 | GR | 31.08.2007 | [2011/46] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
TR | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
DE | 31.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
DE | 31.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
DE | 31.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2873188 (BIENIOSEK CHESTER E) [Y] 12,16* column 1, line 29 - line 70 *; | [XY]EP0048797 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-15 * page 6 - page 8; claims 1-4 * [Y] 4,12,16-31; | [Y]EP0257718 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 4,12,16-31 * page 2, line 1 - line 11 *; | [XY]EP0395767 (TSNIITMASH [SU]) [X] 1-11,15 * the whole document * [Y] 12,16-31; | [Y]EP0467545 (REACTIVE METALS & ALLOYS CORP [US]) [Y] 12,16-31 * page 4, line 29 - line 49; claims 4-9 * | Examination | SU1799916 | US3598573 |