EP1142726 - Thermal transfer image-receiving sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Idehara, Tomoyuki Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd, 1-1-1 Ichigaya Kaga Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Kenji Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd, 1-1-1 Ichigaya Kaga Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 03 /
Nishigaya, Kyoko Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd, 1-1-1 Ichigaya Kaga Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 04 /
Kimura, Kazushi Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd, 1-1-1 Ichigaya Kaga Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 05 /
Saito, Hitoshi Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd, 1-1-1 Ichigaya Kaga Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 06 /
Mishina, Ayako Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd, 1-1-1 Ichigaya Kaga Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108638.6 | 05.04.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | JP20000105425 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000105425 | JP20010063505 | 07.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001063505 | JP20010080819 | 21.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001080819 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1142726 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1142726 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1142726 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
B41M5/529 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/30] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bildempfangsblatt für das thermische Übertragungsdruckverfahren | [2001/41] | English: | Thermal transfer image-receiving sheet | [2001/41] | French: | Feuille réceptrice d'images pour l'impression par transfert thermique | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 13.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9715456 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * claim 1 * * example 1 *; | [X]US5928990 (GUISTINA ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * claims 1,3,8 * * column 9, line 54 - line 57 *; | [X]US5932355 (IQBAL MOHAMMAD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7* claims 5-10 * |